Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Returned Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
House Recede
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Motion Recede (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, Kagan and Simonaire)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Requests House Recede
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {683624/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Reassigned to Economic Matters
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Referred Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {223526/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Hearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2023
|
Pre-filed
|
|
|