Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 899 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {623227/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Motion Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {623227/1 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/13/2024 | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |