House | 02/21/2024 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Third Reading Passed (43-2) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Hearing 2/02 at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |