Senate | 04/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {173322/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Hearing 2/08 at 9:00 a.m. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |