Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (101-36) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {543129/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {233421/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |