Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Conference Committee Report {883027/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Smith, Wolek and Ghrist)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
House Refuses Recede
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators M. Washington, Lewis Young and Carozza)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Requests House Recede
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {553926/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Referred Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Favorable Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|