House | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |