Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 906 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/16 at 11:00 a.m. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | First Reading Finance |