Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 690 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Rereferred to Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |