House | 03/16/2024 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (35-10) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {823320/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {823320/1 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |