Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 579
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Returned Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
House Recede
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Motion Recede (Delegate Atterbeary) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Requests House Recede
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {943023/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2024
|
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Referred Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {953424/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {953424/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|