Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (107-24) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (39-6) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {513022/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/15/2024 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Pre-filed |