Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB42 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/28/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0042*  
  
SENATE BILL 42 
R2   	4lr1432 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 113 
By: Senator Kelly 
Requested: November 1, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 13, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Vehicle Laws – Horse Riding – Helmet Requirement for Minors 2 
 
FOR the purpose of prohibiting an adult from allowing certain minors to ride a horse on 3 
certain property unless the minor is wearing a helmet that meets certain standards; 4 
and generally relating to helmet requirements and horse riding. 5 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 6 
 Article – Transportation 7 
Section 11–101 and 11–127 8 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 9 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 10 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 11 
 Article – Transportation 12 
Section 21–104 13 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 14 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 15 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 16 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 17 
 
Article – Transportation 18 
 
11–101. 19  2 	SENATE BILL 42  
 
 
 
 In the Maryland Vehicle Law, the following words have the meanings indicated, 1 
unless the context requires otherwise. 2 
 
11–127. 3 
 
 “Highway” means: 4 
 
 (1) The entire width between the boundary lines of any way or 5 
thoroughfare of which any part is used by the public for vehicular travel, whether or not 6 
the way or thoroughfare has been dedicated to the public and accepted by any proper 7 
authority; and 8 
 
 (2) For purposes of the application of State laws, the entire width between 9 
the boundary lines of any way or thoroughfare used for purposes of vehicular travel on any 10 
property owned, leased, or controlled by the United States government and located in the 11 
State. 12 
 
21–104. 13 
 
 (a) Every person riding an animal or driving an animal–drawn vehicle on a 14 
roadway has all the rights granted to and is subject to all the duties required of the driver 15 
of a vehicle by this title, except for those provisions of this title that by their very nature 16 
cannot apply. 17 
 
 (b) (1) Except in Charles, Worcester, and St. Mary’s counties, or as provided 18 
in paragraph (2) of this subsection, a person may not ride an animal or drive an  19 
animal–drawn vehicle on: 20 
 
 (i) Any divided highway where the posted maximum speed limit is 21 
more than 35 miles per hour; or 22 
 
 (ii) Any controlled access highway. 23 
 
 (2) In Anne Arundel County, a person may ride an animal on any part of a 24 
highway described in paragraph (1) of this subsection, other than on its roadway or 25 
shoulder. 26 
 
 (C) (1) IN THIS SUBSECTION , “HORSE” INCLUDES DONKEYS , MULES, AND 27 
PONIES. 28 
 
 (2) (I) SUBJECT TO SUBPARAGRA PH (II) OF THIS PARAGRAPH , 29 
THIS SUBSECTION APPL IES ONLY TO HORSE RIDING ON: 30 
 
 1. A HIGHWAY; 31 
   	SENATE BILL 42 	3 
 
 
 2. A PUBLIC HORSE–RIDING PATH OR TRAIL ; OR 1 
 
 3. THE GROUNDS OF A FACI LITY THAT: 2 
 
 A. WHOSE PRIMARY PURPOSE IS EQUESTRIAN 3 
ACTIVITIES; AND 4 
 
 B. THAT SOLICITS OR OFFERS T O THE PUBLIC 5 
RECREATIONAL , EDUCATIONAL , THERAPEUTIC , OR COMPETITIVE EQUES TRIAN 6 
ACTIVITIES. 7 
 
 (II) THIS SUBSECTION DOES NOT APPLY TO A MINOR WHO IS: 8 
 
 1. CROSSING A PUBLIC HIG HWAY THAT SEPARATES 9 
PRIVATELY OWNED LAND ; 10 
 
 2. ENGAGED IN AN AGRICUL TURAL PRACTICE OR 11 
PURSUIT; OR 12 
 
 3. A MEMBER OF AN AMISH OR A MENNONITE 13 
COMMUNITY ; OR 14 
 
 4. RECEIVING THERAPY SER VICES FROM A LICENSE D 15 
MEDICAL PROVIDER AND FOR WHOM THE USE OF AN ALTERNATIVE HELME T IS 16 
NECESSARY, APPROPRIATE , AND IN COMPLIANCE WI TH THE PROFESSIONAL 17 
ASSOCIATION OF THERAPEUTIC HORSEMANSHIP INTERNATIONAL ’S GUIDELINES 18 
FOR ALTERNATIVE HELMET USE. 19 
 
 (3) AN ADULT WHO IS PRESE NT AND DIRECTLY SUPE RVISING A 20 
MINOR MAY NOT ALLOW THE MINOR TO RIDE A HORSE UNLESS THE MIN OR IS 21 
WEARING A PROPERLY S ECURED HELMET THAT M EETS OR EXCEEDS THE 22 
STANDARDS OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF TESTING AND MATERIALS FOR 23 
PROTECTIVE HEADGEAR USED IN EQUESTRIAN R IDING. 24 
 
 (4) A VIOLATION OF THIS SU BSECTION INVOLVING A N ADULT 25 
SUPERVISING MULTIPLE MINORS AT THE SAME T IME SHALL BE TREATED AS A 26 
SINGLE VIOLATION . 27 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 28 
October 1, 2024.  29