Senate | 04/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {263320/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |