Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 862
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Conference Committee Report {413420/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Fisher, A. Johnson and Boafo)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
House Refuses Recede
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Muse, McKay and West)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Requests House Recede
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {163225/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Referred Economic Matters
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (43-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Floor Amendment {743427/1 (Senator Muse) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Floor Amendment {333722/1 (Senator Muse) Withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator West) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Floor Amendment {333722/1 (Senator Muse)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Motion Reconsider Special Order (Senator Muse) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator West) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Floor Amendment {313227/1 (Senator Ellis) Rejected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Favorable Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Smith) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ellis) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Ellis) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|