Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (121-12) | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {493722/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {773723/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |