Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 767 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Floor Amendment {913026/1 (Senator Jackson) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation |