House | 04/08/2024 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {563123/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |