Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Refuses Recede
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kagan, M. Washington and Gallion)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Senate Requests House Recede
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {333023/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Referred Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Floor Amendment {203624/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {233320/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|