House | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (37-9) | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {923526/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |