Senate | 04/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 29 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/19 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {283025/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |