Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2024
|
House Refuses Recede
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Waldstreicher, West and Charles)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2024
|
Senate Requests House Recede
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2024
|
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {893722/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Referred Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {753624/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2024
|
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Pre-filed
|
|
|