Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {523921/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (43-3) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {843324/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |