Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (38-9)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (106-32)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {483024/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2024
|
Referred Appropriations Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (39-6)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Favorable Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
|
|
|