Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (101-36) | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (33-11) | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {503824/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/16 at 11:00 a.m. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | First Reading Finance |