Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 976 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-1) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |