House | 03/01/2024 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {783422/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | First Reading Finance |