Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 623 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Beidle) Adopted | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (134-2) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {113324/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {563627/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/16 at 11:00 a.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | First Reading Finance |