Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (39-6) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |