Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {353326/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2024
|
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2024
|
Referred Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Floor Amendment {393226/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {713527/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {713527/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|