Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {313928/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {703129/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |