Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1005 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {303623/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {943227/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | First Reading Finance |