Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Floor Amendment {583624/1 (Delegate Solomon) Adopted | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {913221/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {443727/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Corderman) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {443727/1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | First Reading Finance |