Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rereferred to Ways and Means | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {513825/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings |