Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 632 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (132-3) | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {223224/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |