Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (133-2) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {693628/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |