Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 879 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (134-3) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {313526/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Finance | ||
Senate | 10/31/2023 | Pre-filed |