House | 04/04/2024 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (35-12) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Floor Amendment {513828/1 (Senator Gallion) Rejected (13-33) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Floor Amendment {913826/1 (Senator Gallion) Rejected (13-33) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {323925/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Gallion) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {323925/1 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | First Reading Finance and Education, Energy, and the Environment |