Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |