Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {873626/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {613422/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |