Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (102-33) | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading Passed (35-11) | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {273424/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/16 at 11:00 a.m. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | First Reading Finance |