House | 03/19/2024 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (35-8) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {223625/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {223625/1 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | First Reading Finance |