Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (35-12) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments (35-12) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {303629/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {293429/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |