Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Returned Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2024
|
Referred Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {273824/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
|
|
|