Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 730 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (134-2) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {933024/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |