Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 724 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |