House | 04/02/2024 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {813227/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |