EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. *sb0695* SENATE BILL 695 E4 4lr2681 CF 4lr2682 By: Senator Feldman Introduced and read first time: January 29, 2024 Assigned to: Education, Energy, and the Environment A BILL ENTITLED AN ACT concerning 1 Building Code – Construction and Significant Renovation of Housing Units – 2 Electric Vehicle Parking Spaces 3 FOR the purpose of requiring the construction of new multifamily residential buildings 4 with separate garages, carports, or driveways for each residential unit to include 5 certain parking spaces for electric vehicle charging; requiring certain significant 6 renovations of housing units with separate garages, carports, or driveways for each 7 residential unit to include certain parking spaces for electric vehicle recharging; 8 requiring the construction or significant renovations of housing units with certain 9 common use parking to include certain parking spaces for electric vehicle recharging; 10 and generally relating to electric vehicle parking space requirements for multifamily 11 housing units. 12 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 13 Article – Public Safety 14 Section 12–205 15 Annotated Code of Maryland 16 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 17 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 18 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 19 Article – Public Safety 20 12–205. 21 (a) (1) In this section the following words have the meanings indicated. 22 (2) “Electric vehicle” means a vehicle that uses electricity for propulsion. 23 2 SENATE BILL 695 (3) “Electric vehicle supply equipment” means a device or facility for 1 delivering electricity to an electric vehicle. 2 (4) “EV–ready parking space” means a parking space that has electrical 3 panel capacity and full circuit installation of a minimum 40–ampere, 208/240–volt circuit, 4 raceway wiring, a NEMA 14–50R receptacle, and circuit overcurrent protection devices. 5 (5) “EVSE–installed parking space” means a parking space with electric 6 vehicle supply equipment that is fully installed from the electrical panel to the parking 7 space. 8 (6) [(i)] “Housing units” means: 9 [1.] (I) single–family detached houses; 10 [2.] (II) duplexes; [and] 11 [3.] (III) town houses that are subject to the provisions of the 12 International Residential Code; AND 13 [(ii) “Housing units” does not include multifamily residential 14 buildings that are subject to the provisions of the International Building Code.] 15 (IV) MULTIFAMILY RESIDENT IAL BUILDINGS. 16 (7) “Level 2 charging” means that the charging capability of the electric 17 vehicle supply equipment: 18 (i) includes the ability to charge a battery or any other energy 19 storage device in an electric vehicle through means of an alternating current electrical 20 service with a minimum of 208 volts; and 21 (ii) meets applicable industry safety standards. 22 (8) “MULTIFAMILY RESIDENTI AL BUILDING” MEANS A BUILDING 23 THAT: 24 (I) CONTAINS TWO OR MORE LEASED OR OWNED RESIDENTIAL 25 UNITS; AND 26 (II) IS SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF THE INTERNATIONAL 27 BUILDING CODE. 28 (9) “SIGNIFICANT RENOVATIO N” MEANS: 29 SENATE BILL 695 3 (I) A RENOVATION TO A HOUSING UNIT THAT INCLUDES 1 ELECTRICAL PANEL UPGRADES THAT INCREASE THE CAPACIT Y OF THE PANEL; OR 2 (II) PARKING UPGRADES THAT INVOLVE REPAVING OR 3 TRENCHING IN OR AROU ND PARKING SPACES . 4 [(8)] (10) “Vehicle” has the meaning stated in § 11 –176 of the 5 Transportation Article. 6 (b) (1) This subsection applies to the construction OR SIGNIFICANT 7 RENOVATION of housing units that include a separate garage, carport, or driveway for 8 each residential unit. 9 (2) The construction of a new housing unit OR SIGNIFICANT 10 RENOVATION TO AN EXISTING HOUSI NG UNIT shall include in or on the garage, carport, 11 or driveway: 12 (i) one EVSE–installed parking space capable of providing at least 13 Level 2 charging; or 14 (ii) one EV–ready parking space. 15 (C) (1) THIS SUBSECTION DOES NOT APPLY TO THE CONSTRUCTION OR 16 SIGNIFICANT RENOVATI ON OF HOUSING UNITS THAT INCLUDE SEPARAT E GARAGES, 17 CARPORTS, OR DRIVEWAY S FOR EACH RESIDENTIAL UNIT . 18 (2) IF THE CONSTRUCTION OR SIGNIFICANT RENOV ATION OF 19 HOUSING UNITS INCLUD ES OR WILL INCLUDE ON–SITE, OFF–STREET, COMMON USE 20 PARKING, THE CONSTRUCTION OR SIGNIFICANT RENOVATI ON OF THE HOUSING 21 UNITS SHALL INCLUDE , FOR EVERY 25 RESIDENTIAL UNITS, AT LEAST ONE COMMON 22 USE EVSE–INSTALLED PARKING SP ACE. 23 (3) IN ADDITION TO THE RE QUIREMENTS OF PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS 24 SUBSECTION, CONSTRUCTION OF A NE W HOUSING UNIT SHALL INCLUDE: 25 (I) AT LEAST ONE EVSE–INSTALLED PARKING SP ACE CAPABLE 26 OF PROVIDING AT LEAST LEVEL 2 CHARGING LOCATED IN A COMMON USE PARKING 27 AREA THAT IS AVAILABLE FOR USE BY ALL RESID ENTS; AND 28 (II) THE FOLLOWING NUMBER OF EV–READY PARKING SPACES 29 DEDICATED TO SPECIFI C RESIDENTIAL UNITS OR FOR COMMON USE : 30 4 SENATE BILL 695 1. FOR A DEVELOPMENT APPLICAT ION OR BUILDING 1 PERMIT APPLICATION M ADE ON OR AFTER OCTOBER 1, 2024, AT LEAST 10% OF THE 2 PARKING SPACES ; 3 2. FOR A DEVELOPMENT AP PLICATION OR BUILDIN G 4 PERMIT APPLICATION M ADE ON OR AFTER JANUARY 1, 2030, AT LEAST 20% OF THE 5 PARKING SPACES; AND 6 3. FOR A DEVELOPMENT AP PLICATION OR BUILDIN G 7 PERMIT APPLICATION M ADE ON OR AFTER JANUARY 1, 2035, AT LEAST 30% OF THE 8 PARKING SPACES . 9 (4) EACH COMMON USE EVSE–INSTALLED PARKING SP ACE 10 INSTALLED IN ACCORDA NCE WITH THIS SUBSEC TION SHALL BE MARKED WITH A 11 SIGN THAT: 12 (I) INDICATES THAT THE CH ARGING SPACE IS ONLY FOR 13 ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHA RGING; 14 (II) INCLUDES ANY DAY OR T IME RESTRICTIONS ; 15 (III) STATES THE MAXIMUM FI NE THAT MAY BE INCUR RED FOR A 16 VIOLATION; AND 17 (IV) IS CONSISTENT WITH TH E DESIGN AND PLACEME NT 18 SPECIFICATIONS ESTAB LISHED IN THE MANUAL ON UNIFORM TRAFFIC CONTROL 19 DEVICES FOR STREETS AND HIGHWAYS ADOPTED BY T HE STATE HIGHWAY 20 ADMINISTRATION UNDER § 25–104 OF THE TRANSPORTATION ARTICLE. 21 [(c)] (D) Notwithstanding any other law, a county or municipal corporation may 22 require the construction of housing units to include a greater number of EVSE–installed 23 parking spaces or EV–ready parking spaces than are required under [subsection] 24 SUBSECTIONS (b) AND (C) of this section. 25 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 26 October 1, 2024. 27