House | 04/05/2024 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {503125/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |