Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {513622/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/17/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {463925/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/15/2024 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Finance | ||
Senate | 09/03/2023 | Pre-filed |